Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pierre de Villars

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Vienne, France


Events

DateEventTitle
31 Jan 1561AppointedBishop of Mirepoix, France
9 May 1575AppointedArchbishop of Vienne, France
1587²ResignedArchbishop of Vienne, France
14 Nov 1592DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Vienne, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre de Villars
Archbishop Pierre de Villars (died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Vienne

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 333, and Page 246
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1561, Number 7*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018