Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Henri de Villars

Deceased

Archbishop of Vienne, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1621¹Born
30 Aug 165534.6AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Vienne, France
30 Aug 165534.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Philippopolis in Arabia
25 May 166241.3SucceededArchbishop of Vienne, France
27 Dec 169372.9DiedArchbishop of Vienne, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Henri de Villars
Archbishop Henri de Villars (born 1621, died ) Archbishop of Vienne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 368, and Page 280
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1655, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018