Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Blasius de Vicariis

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Capharnaum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Feb 1660Born
26 Feb 168424.0Ordained PriestPriest
15 Nov 172868.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Capharnaum
18 Dec 173373.8DiedTitular Bishop of Capharnaum

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Blasius de Vicariis
Bishop Blasius de Vicariis (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Capharnaum

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSalerno

  • a priest for 49.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 140
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,728, Number 63

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast