Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Duranti

Deceased

Bishop of Termoli, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Oct 1536AppointedBishop of Termoli, Italy
18 Feb 1537Ordained BishopBishop of Termoli, Italy
5 Jul 1539DiedBishop of Termoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Duranti
Bishop Pietro Duranti (died ) Bishop of Termoli

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalazzolo sull'Oglio

  • a bishop for 2.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 312
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 18,955
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1537, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018