Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lucas Duran, O.S. †

Deceased

Bishop of Albarracin


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Jan 1605AppointedBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
1607¹ResignedBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
17 Aug 1611AppointedBishop of Albarracin, Spain
21 Dec 1617DiedBishop of Albarracin, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lucas Duran:
Bishop Lucas Duran O.S. (died ) Bishop of Albarracin

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 74, and Page 148
  • bp/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 121, Number 770
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1605, Number 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 9 Feb 2015