Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Martin Duplštre

Deceased

Abbot of Saint-Maurice, Switzerland


Events

DateEventTitle
1 Mar 1572SelectedAbbot of Saint-Maurice, Switzerland
1 May 1573ConfirmedAbbot of Saint-Maurice, Switzerland
19 Mar 1587DiedAbbot of Saint-Maurice, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Martin Duplštre
Abbot Martin Duplštre (died ) Abbot of Saint-Maurice

Source(s):
  • b: Google Books, 2,015, 11, 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast