Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Dupin (de Pins)

Deceased

Bishop of Rieux, France


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Dec 1520AppointedBishop of Pamiers, France
22 Dec 1522AppointedBishop of Rieux, France
1 Nov 1537DiedBishop of Rieux, France

MicroData Summary for Jean Dupin (de Pins)
Bishop Jean Dupin (de Pins) (died ) Bishop of Rieux

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 286, and Page 111
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1520, Number 36*
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 89, Number 7,452
  • ~ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 92, Number 7,452

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast