Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernard Dunne

Deceased

Bishop of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland


Events

DateEventTitle
25 Nov 1724SelectedBishop of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland
16 Dec 1724ConfirmedBishop of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland
1725¹Ordained BishopBishop of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland
26 Aug 1733DiedBishop of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernard Dunne
Bishop Bernard Dunne (died ) Bishop of Kildare and Leighlin

  • a bishop for 8.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 232, and Page 241
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1725, Number 58
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 20 Aug 2020

Quantcast