Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Piotr Dunin Wolski

Deceased

Bishop of Płock, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1531¹Born
5 Jul 157746.5AppointedBishop of Płock, Poland
15 Mar 157847.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
16 Mar 157847.2Ordained PriestPriest
14 Sep 157847.7Ordained BishopBishop of Płock, Poland
20 Aug 159059.6DiedBishop of Płock, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Piotr Dunin Wolski (VIAF: 55038449)
Bishop Piotr Dunin Wolski (born 1531, died ) Bishop of Płock

  • a priest for 12.4 years
  • a bishop for 11.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 276
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,359
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1578, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018