Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gavin Dunbar

Deceased

Archbishop of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1490²Born
8 Jul 152434.5AppointedArchbishop of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain
5 Feb 152535.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain
30 Apr 154757.3DiedArchbishop of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gavin Dunbar (VIAF: 305289266)
Archbishop Gavin Dunbar (born 1490, died ) Archbishop of Glasgow

  • a bishop for 22.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 203
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,525, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast