Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriel du Mas

Deceased

Bishop of Périgueux (Vesuna), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1446¹Born
5 Apr 147529.2AppointedBishop of Mirepoix, France
3 Dec 147529.9Ordained BishopBishop of Mirepoix, France
15 Mar 148640.2AppointedBishop of Périgueux (Vesuna), France
1500¹54.0DiedBishop of Périgueux (Vesuna), France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gabriel du Mas
Bishop Gabriel du Mas (born 1446, died 1500) Bishop of Périgueux (Vesuna)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSaint-Bernard, Church, Paris, Diocese of Paris

  • a bishop for 24.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 193, and Page 215
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,303
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,475, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast