Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Duffy, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of York, England, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Ascalon


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Jul 1531AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Saint Asaph, Wales, Great Britain
10 Jul 1531AppointedTitular Bishop of Ascalon
16 Jul 1531Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ascalon
1535²AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of York, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for William Duffy
Bishop William Duffy O.F.M. , Auxiliary Bishop of York

EventPlace
Ordained BishopS. Esprit, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 119
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Number 7,488
  • b/c23: CB, 18 Feb 2016
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1531, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast