Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Bruno Marie Duffé

Secretary Emeritus of the Dicastery for Promoting Integral Human Development

Priest of Lyon (-Vienne)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Aug 1951 Born
Jun 1981³29.7Ordained PriestPriest of Lyon (-Vienne), France
16 Jun 201765.8AppointedSecretary of the Dicastery for Promoting Integral Human Development
1 Jul 202169.8ResignedSecretary of the Dicastery for Promoting Integral Human Development

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bruno Marie Duffé (VIAF: 64058136)
Father Bruno Marie Duffé (born ) Secretary Emeritus of Promoting Integral Human Development

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLyon, Archdiocese of Lyon (-Vienne), France

Please contact the Father through the Dicastery for Promoting Integral Human Development.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Jun 2017
  • r: Bollettino, 26 Aug 2021
  • r: AM, 30 Aug 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 31 Aug 2021

Quantcast