Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick Duffy, O.F.M. Ref. †

Deceased

Bishop of Clogher, Ireland


Events

DateEventTitle
16 May 1671SelectedBishop of Clogher, Ireland
13 Jul 1671ConfirmedBishop of Clogher, Ireland
10 Oct 1671Ordained BishopBishop of Clogher, Ireland
1673InstalledBishop of Clogher, Ireland
1 Aug 1675DiedBishop of Clogher, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Patrick Duffy
Bishop Patrick Duffy O.F.M. Ref. (died ) Bishop of Clogher

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAghnamullan, Co. Monaghan
Buried Place (Original)Ballyduffy

  • a bishop for 3.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 162
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1671, Number 63
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 226, Number 18,780
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast