Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mikolaj Duchnowski

Deceased

Bishop of Supraśl (Ukrainian), Belarus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1733Born
1773¹39.0Ordained PriestPriest
15 Jul 180167.5SelectedBishop of Supraśl (Ukrainian), Belarus
16 May 180369.4ConfirmedBishop of Supraśl (Ukrainian), Belarus
29 Apr 180470.3Ordained BishopBishop of Supraśl (Ukrainian), Belarus
25 Jun 180571.5DiedBishop of Supraśl (Ukrainian), Belarus

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mikolaj Duchnowski
Bishop Mikolaj Duchnowski (born , died ) Bishop of Supraśl

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSiemiatycze

  • a priest for 32.4 years
  • a bishop for 1.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,773
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Number 12,898
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 354
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1804, Number 9
  • b: Hierarchy of the Kyivan Church 861-1990, Page 292

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018