Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean du Bec (-Crespin)

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Malo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1540BornBec-Helluin
30 Oct 159656.8SelectedBishop of Saint-Malo, France
18 Sep 159858.7ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Malo, France
14 Mar 159959.2Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Malo, France
20 Jan 161070.1DiedBishop of Saint-Malo, France

MicroData Summary for Jean du Bec (-Crespin):
Bishop Jean du Bec (-Crespin) (died ) Bishop of Saint-Malo

  • a bishop for 10.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013