Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Marie-Bernard de Terris, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Abbot Emeritus

Titular See: (Lérins)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1908Born
26 Dec 192921.0ProfessedMember of Order of Cistercians
12 Jul 193627.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Cistercians
1958²49.0AppointedAbbot
1989²80.0ResignedAbbot
1994²85.0DiedAbbot Emeritus

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marie-Bernard de Terris
Abbot Marie-Bernard de Terris O. Cist. (born , died 1994) Abbot Emeritus

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Michel, France

  • a priest for 57.4 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Jul 2017