Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cristoforo di San Marcello

Deceased

Bishop of Siena


Events

DateEventTitle
2 May 1431AppointedBishop of Cervia, Italy
21 Nov 1435AppointedBishop of Rimini, Italy
18 Sep 1444AppointedBishop of Siena, Italy
Nov 1444³DiedBishop of Siena, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cristoforo di San Marcello:
Bishop Cristoforo di San Marcello Bishop of Siena

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 95, and Page 126
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 235

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013