Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giorgio di Saluzzo

Deceased

Bishop of Lausanne, Switzerland


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Feb 1433AppointedBishop of Aosta, Italy
1 Apr 1440AppointedBishop of Lausanne, Switzerland
5 Nov 1461DiedBishop of Lausanne, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Giorgio di Saluzzo
Bishop Giorgio di Saluzzo (died ) Bishop of Lausanne

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast