Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Papiniano della Rovere

Deceased

Bishop of Parma, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Feb 1296AppointedBishop of Novara, Italy
3 Jun 1300AppointedBishop of Parma, Italy
14 Aug 1316DiedBishop of Parma, Italy

MicroData Summary for Papiniano della Rovere
Bishop Papiniano della Rovere (died ) Bishop of Parma

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 392, and Page 372

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 14 Apr 2020

Quantcast