Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles de Rousseau

Deceased

Bishop of Mende, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1569¹Born
4 Dec 160637.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Mende, France
4 Dec 160637.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Metropolis in Asia
26 Jun 160839.4SucceededBishop of Mende, France
4 Nov 162354.8DiedBishop of Mende, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Charles de Rousseau
Bishop Charles de Rousseau (born 1569, died ) Bishop of Mende

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLe Mans

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 242, and Page 240
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,607, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast