Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Luigi Cardinal de’ Rossi

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Clemente


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1474Born
1 Jul 151742.9Elevated to Cardinal
6 Jul 151742.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Clemente
20 Aug 151945.0DiedCardinal-Priest of San Clemente

MicroData Summary for Luigi de’ Rossi
Luigi Cardinal de’ Rossi (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Clemente

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFlorence, Italy

  • a cardinal for 2.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Jul 1517

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast