Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardo de’ Rossi

Deceased

Bishop of Treviso, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1465¹Born
4 Apr 148722.2AppointedBishop of Belluno, Italy
16 Aug 149934.6AppointedBishop of Treviso, Italy
28 Jun 152762.4DiedBishop of Treviso, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernardo de’ Rossi
Bishop Bernardo de’ Rossi (born 1465, died ) Bishop of Treviso

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 249, and Page 103
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1487, Number 22*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 30 Dec 2018

Quantcast