Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Girolamo de’ Rossi

Deceased

Bishop of Pavia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 May 1505Born
3 Jun 153025.0AppointedBishop of Pavia, Italy
1541¹35.6ResignedBishop of Pavia, Italy
22 Feb 155044.7AppointedBishop of Pavia, Italy
5 Apr 156458.8DiedBishop of Pavia, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Girolamo de’ Rossi
Bishop Giovanni Girolamo de’ Rossi (born , died ) Bishop of Pavia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Secondo Parmense, Diocese of Parma
Death PlacePrato, Diocese of Pistoia

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 269
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1530, Number 18*
  • b/d: AT, 12 Jun 2019
  • b/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 240, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast