Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni de Rosa

Deceased

Bishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Jan 1520AppointedBishop of Svač, Serbia
12 Oct 1524AppointedBishop of Scardona (Skradin), Italy
23 Apr 1531AppointedBishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia
1549²DiedBishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni de Rosa
Bishop Giovanni de Rosa (died 1549) Bishop of Krk (Veglia)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 294, and Page 305
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 328

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018