Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Camille DesRosiers, S.M. †

Deceased

Superior Emeritus of Funafuti, Tuvalu, Pacific (Oceania)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1928Born
8 Sep 195021.9ProfessedMember of Society of Mary
4 Jun 195526.6Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Mary
14 Jul 198657.7AppointedSuperior of Funafuti, Tuvalu, Pacific (Oceania)
201081.2ResignedSuperior of Funafuti, Tuvalu, Pacific (Oceania)
16 May 201687.5DiedSuperior Emeritus of Funafuti, Tuvalu, Pacific (Oceania)

MicroData Summary for Camille DesRosiers
Father Camille DesRosiers S.M. (born , died ) Superior Emeritus of Funafuti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGrand-Métis, Canada

  • a priest for 60.9 years

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018