Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Daniel Duranti, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Skopje, North Macedonia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1633³Born
8 Mar 166430.4Ordained PriestPriest
11 Dec 169057.2AppointedArchbishop of Skopje, North Macedonia
1691¹57.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Skopje, North Macedonia
29 Jul 170268.8ResignedArchbishop of Skopje, North Macedonia
1712¹78.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Skopje, North Macedonia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Daniel Duranti
Archbishop Daniel Duranti O.F.M. (born , died 1712) Archbishop Emeritus of Skopje

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArezzo

  • a priest for 47.8 years
  • a bishop for 21.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 129, and Page 158
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 346, and Page 360
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,691, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast