Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacinto Dragonetti, C.O. †

Deceased

Bishop of Marsi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1666¹BornL'Aquila
4 Jun 168923.4Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
5 Mar 170337.1AppointedBishop of Nusco, Italy
11 Sep 172458.6AppointedBishop of Marsi, Italy
21 Nov 172559.8InstalledBishop of Marsi, Italy
20 Dec 173064.9DiedBishop of Marsi, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giacinto Dragonetti:
Bishop Giacinto Dragonetti C.O. (born 1666, died ) Bishop of Marsi

  • a priest for 41.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 257, and Page 294
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1703, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 14 Jun 2015