Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ludovico della Quadra

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mottola (Motula), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1625Born
4 Mar 166438.6SelectedBishop of Mottola (Motula), Italy
21 Jul 166439.0ConfirmedBishop of Mottola (Motula), Italy
15 Jan 169569.5ResignedBishop of Mottola (Motula), Italy

MicroData Summary for Ludovico della Quadra
Bishop Ludovico della Quadra (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Mottola (Motula)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarpi

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 250
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 276
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1664, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018