Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoine de Prez

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Aosta


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Oct 1444AppointedBishop of Aosta, Italy
4 Apr 1464ResignedBishop of Aosta, Italy
16 May 1464DiedBishop Emeritus of Aosta, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antoine de Prez:
Bishop Antoine de Prez (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Aosta

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013