Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco del Pozzo

Deceased

Bishop of Agrigento (Girgenti)


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Jan 1591AppointedBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy
8 May 1591Ordained BishopBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy
7 Mar 1593DiedBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco del Pozzo (VIAF: 90315180)
Bishop Francesco del Pozzo (died ) Bishop of Agrigento (Girgenti)

  • a bishop for 1.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 99
  • b/c3: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 18,965

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 28 Sep 2016