Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop George Dowdall, O. Crucif. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Armagh, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1487²Born
1543²56.0SelectedArchbishop
Dec 1543³56.9Ordained BishopArchbishop
1 Mar 155366.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland
15 Aug 155871.6DiedArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for George Dowdall
Archbishop George Dowdall O. Crucif. (born 1487, died ) Archbishop of Armagh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDrogheda

  • a bishop for 14.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 118
  • b/c2: CB, 9 Aug 2016
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 18,956
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1543, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018