Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stephen Dowdall

Deceased

Bishop of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Dec 1733SelectedBishop of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland
22 Dec 1733ConfirmedBishop of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland
1734¹Ordained BishopBishop of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland
12 Feb 1737³DiedBishop of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Stephen Dowdall
Bishop Stephen Dowdall (died ) Bishop of Kildare and Leighlin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNavan, Co. Cavan

  • a bishop for 3.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 248
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1734, Number 37
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast