Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giorgio Cardinal Doria Pamphilj Landi

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation of (Sacred) Rites

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Nov 1772Born
31 May 180431.5Ordained PriestPriest
8 Mar 181643.3Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
22 Jul 181643.6Elevated to Cardinal
22 Jul 181643.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Via
16 Mar 181845.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia
10 Feb 182148.2AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of (Sacred) Rites
16 Nov 183764.9DiedPrefect of the Congregation of (Sacred) Rites

MicroData Summary for Giorgio Doria Pamphilj Landi (VIAF: 89059314)
Giorgio Cardinal Doria Pamphilj Landi (born , died ) Prefect of (Sacred) Rites

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Italy

  • a priest for 33.4 years
  • a cardinal for 21.6 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018