Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Donzelli, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Sorrento


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Jul 1574AppointedArchbishop of Sorrento, Italy
13 Apr 1586AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
Aug 1587³ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
22 Apr 1588DiedArchbishop of Sorrento, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Donzelli
Archbishop Giuseppe Donzelli O.P. (died ) Archbishop of Sorrento

Source(s):
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes, Page 264
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 306

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 6 Oct 2016