Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Salvador Donos Rodríguez

Deceased

Ecclesiastical Governor (Vicar General) of Valparaíso, Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1840Born
21 Jun 186423.6Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
188544.2AppointedEcclesiastical Governor (Vicar General) of Valparaíso, Chile
8 Aug 189251.8DiedEcclesiastical Governor (Vicar General) of Valparaíso, Chile

MicroData Summary for Salvador Donos Rodríguez
Father Salvador Donos Rodríguez (born , died ) Ecclesiastical Governor (Vicar General) of Valparaíso

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantiago, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile

  • a priest for 28.1 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast