Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Donato (DonÓ)

Deceased

Bishop of Bergamo, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
2 Apr 1462AppointedBishop of Belluno, Italy
9 Jan 1465AppointedBishop of Bergamo, Italy
20 Jul 1484DiedBishop of Bergamo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Donato (DonÓ)
Bishop Luigi Donato (DonÓ) (died ) Bishop of Bergamo

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 103, and Page 214
  • b: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1462, Number 11*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast