Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François de Donadieu

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Auxerre, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1559¹Born
4 Jun 159940.4AppointedBishop of Auxerre, France
1 Aug 159940.5Ordained BishopBishop of Auxerre, France
1624¹65.0ResignedBishop of Auxerre, France
5 Jan 164081.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Auxerre, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François de Donadieu
Bishop François de Donadieu (born 1559, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Auxerre

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSan Pietro in Vincoli, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceAlan, Hte Garonne

  • a bishop for 40.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 87
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 231, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1599, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast