Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Waricus de Dommartin

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Verdun, France


Events

DateEventTitle
12 Jul 1499AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Verdun, France
20 Feb 1500SucceededBishop of Verdun, France
7 Jul 1508DiedBishop-Elect of Verdun, France

MicroData Summary for Waricus de Dommartin
Father Waricus de Dommartin (died ) Bishop-Elect of Verdun

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 269
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1499
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 335

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast