Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Raffaele Dolci, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Stagno (Ston), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1738Born
6 Mar 176224.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
22 Jul 180062.3SelectedBishop of Stagno (Ston), Croatia
20 Oct 180062.6ConfirmedBishop of Stagno (Ston), Croatia
1807¹68.8DiedBishop of Stagno (Ston), Croatia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Raffaele Dolci
Bishop Antonio Raffaele Dolci O.P. (born , died 1807) Bishop of Stagno (Ston)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRagusa

  • a priest for 44.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1800, Number 28
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 352

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 21 Apr 2018