Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Inocêncio António das Neves Portugal, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Oct 1759Born
23 Feb 178323.3Ordained PriestPriest
19 Aug 182363.8SelectedBishop of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal
24 Nov 182364.0ConfirmedBishop of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal
30 Mar 182464.4DiedBishop-Elect of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Inocêncio António das Neves Portugal
Father Inocêncio António das Neves Portugal O. Carm. (born , died ) Bishop-Elect of Faro {Algarve}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a priest for 41.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 304
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,824

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast