Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giancarlo Cardinal de’ Medici

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of San Giorgio in Velabro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jul 1611Born
14 Nov 164433.3Elevated to Cardinal
20 Mar 164533.6InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria Nuova
6 Mar 165644.6AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Giorgio in Velabro
23 Jan 166351.4DiedCardinal-Deacon of San Giorgio in Velabro

MicroData Summary
Giancarlo de’ Medici
Giancarlo Cardinal de’ Medici
(born , died )
Cardinal-Deacon of San Giorgio in Velabro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFirenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}, Italy

Relatives
  • a cardinal for 18.1 years

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 14 Nov 1644

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.3, 19 May 2025; Data: 20 May 2025