Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dinis de Melo e Castro

Deceased

Bishop of Guarda


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Jan 1627SelectedBishop of Leiria, Portugal
9 Aug 1627ConfirmedBishop of Leiria, Portugal
9 Dec 1635SelectedBishop of Viseu, Portugal
14 May 1636ConfirmedBishop of Viseu, Portugal
7 Feb 1639AppointedBishop of Guarda, Portugal
24 Nov 1639DiedBishop of Guarda, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Dinis de Melo e Castro:
Bishop Dinis de Melo e Castro (died ) Bishop of Guarda

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 180, and Page 371
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 219
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1627, Number 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 2 Mar 2015