Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio della Marra, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Carinola (Calina), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 May 1646³Born
18 May 166216.0ProfessedMember of Congregation of Clerics Regular
25 Jan 170659.6AppointedBishop of Carinola (Calina), Italy
13 May 171467.9DiedBishop of Carinola (Calina), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio della Marra
Bishop Antonio della Marra C.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Carinola (Calina)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBarletta

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 136
  • bp/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1706, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast