Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco da M„e dos Homens Anes de Carvalho

Deceased

Archbishop of …vora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Sep 1780Born…vora
30 Nov 180323.2Ordained PriestPriest
1 Oct 184565.0SelectedArchbishop of …vora, Portugal
24 Nov 184565.2ConfirmedArchbishop of …vora, Portugal
1 Feb 184665.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of …vora, Portugal
3 Dec 185979.2DiedArchbishop of …vora, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Francisco da M„e dos Homens Anes de Carvalho:
Archbishop Francisco da M„e dos Homens Anes de Carvalho (born , died ) Archbishop of …vora

  • a priest for 56.0 years
  • a bishop for 13.8 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,228
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 185

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013