Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thibauld de Luxembourg, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Le Mans, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1418Born
11 May 146547.3AppointedBishop of Le Mans, France
4 Nov 147658.8ResignedBishop of Le Mans, France
1 Sep 147759.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Le Mans, France

Note(s): ⁷ After

MicroData Summary for Thibauld de Luxembourg
Bishop Thibauld de Luxembourg O. Cist. (born 1418, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Le Mans

EventPlace
Birth Place
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 124
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 7 May 1473
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1465, Number 18*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast