Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignatius Dłuski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec)

Titular Bishop of Hebron


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1724³BornKumowicz
28 Mar 175025.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
23 May 175025.5Ordained PriestPriest
1 Jun 177853.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec), Ukraine
1 Jun 177853.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Hebron

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ignatius Dłuski:
Bishop Ignatius Dłuski (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 233, and Page 453
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1778, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 27 Dec 2015