Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Battista Cardinal de Luca

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Girolamo dei Croati


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1614Born
1 Sep 168167.6Elevated to Cardinal
22 Sep 168167.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Girolamo dei Croati
5 Feb 168369.0DiedCardinal-Priest of San Girolamo dei Croati

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista de Luca
Giovanni Battista Cardinal de Luca (born 1614, died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Girolamo dei Croati

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenosa, Italy

  • a cardinal for 1.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Sep 1681

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018