Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adhémar de La Roche (Fabri), O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Genève {Geneva}


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Nov 1363AppointedTitular Bishop of Bethleem
10 Nov 1378AppointedBishop of Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux, France
12 Jul 1385AppointedBishop of Genève {Geneva}, Switzerland
8 Oct 1388DiedBishop of Genève {Geneva}, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Adhémar de La Roche (Fabri):
Bishop Adhémar de La Roche (Fabri) O.P. (died ) Bishop of Genève {Geneva}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 135, and Page 497
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 260

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013