Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Francesco de Lorenzi

Deceased

Bishop of Venosa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1635BornRipan
14 May 168550.1AppointedBishop of Venosa, Italy
Oct 169863.5DiedBishop of Venosa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Francesco de Lorenzi:
Bishop Giovanni Francesco de Lorenzi (born ) Bishop of Venosa

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013